Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate GOV Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Assigned to Senate GOV Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (48-12-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (25-30-4-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House GOV Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|