Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2593 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 28, 2024
Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024