Senate | 03/06/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-0-0) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-1-0-0) | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |