Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2633 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024