Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Chapter 197
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (42-15-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-7-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Assigned to Senate FICO Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (36-18-6-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (28-32-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to House GOV Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|