Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2721 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 16, 2024
Analysis May 8, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024