Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-15-0-0) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |