Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2835 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024