Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2885 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 11, 2024