Senate | 02/06/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (47-9-1-0) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Assigned to House LARA Committee | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Prefile |