Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCR2002 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Engrossed

Bill January 31, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024