House | 03/12/2024 | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |