Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCR2042 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024