Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Chapter 103
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (54-0-5-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House RA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Assigned to House RA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-5-4-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Assigned to Senate FICO Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Prefile
|
|
|