Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1042 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 10, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis April 1, 2024
Analysis March 28, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis March 15, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024