Senate | 02/28/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |