Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1057 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024