Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Chapter 157
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (48-10-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-7-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|