Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1065 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 04/22/2024

                            Senate Engrossed   cotton research protection council; continuation           State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024           CHAPTER 157       SENATE BILL 1065              An Act   repealing section 41-3024.07, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3032.07; relating to the cotton research and protection council.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

 

Senate Engrossed   cotton research protection council; continuation
State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024
CHAPTER 157
SENATE BILL 1065

Senate Engrossed

 

cotton research protection council; continuation

 

 

 

State of Arizona

Senate

Fifty-sixth Legislature

Second Regular Session

2024

 

 

 

CHAPTER 157

 

SENATE BILL 1065

 

 

 

An Act

 

repealing section 41-3024.07, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3032.07; relating to the cotton research and protection council.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3024.07, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3032.07, to read: START_STATUTE41-3032.07. Cotton research and protection council; termination July 1, 2032 A. The cotton research and protection council terminates on July 1, 2032. B. Title 3, chapter 10 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2033. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Legislative intent Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the cotton research and protection council to further cotton research activities, to provide monies, on a revolving basis, in furtherance of the abatement procedures provided by law and to support any cotton pest eradication programs and activities. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to from and after July 1, 2024. 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Repeal

Section 41-3024.07, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.

Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3032.07, to read:

START_STATUTE41-3032.07. Cotton research and protection council; termination July 1, 2032

A. The cotton research and protection council terminates on July 1, 2032.

B. Title 3, chapter 10 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2033. END_STATUTE

Sec. 3. Legislative intent

Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the cotton research and protection council to further cotton research activities, to provide monies, on a revolving basis, in furtherance of the abatement procedures provided by law and to support any cotton pest eradication programs and activities.

Sec. 4. Retroactivity

Sections 1 and 2 of this act are effective retroactively to from and after July 1, 2024.

       APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 16, 2024.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 16, 2024. 

 

 

 

APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 16, 2024.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 16, 2024.