Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1162 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 10, 2024
Analysis April 23, 2024
Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 28, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 24, 2024