Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis April 24, 2024
Analysis April 23, 2024
Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024