Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Chapter 231
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2024
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (23-3-4-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2024
|
Senate concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (38-21-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Livingston, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1185. Passed by vv.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (29-27-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|