Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1185 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis June 19, 2024
Analysis June 14, 2024
Analysis April 5, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024