Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1199 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024