House | 03/20/2024 | House WM Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-5-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to House WM Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |