Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1213 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 12, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024