Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Chapter 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-2-4-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|