Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1214 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024

Chaptered

Bill March 26, 2024