Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1256 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 04/22/2024

                            Senate Engrossed   pioneers' home; miners' hospital; continuation           State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024           CHAPTER 161       SENATE BILL 1256              An Act   repealing section 41-3024.12, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3032.12; relating to the Arizona pioneers' home and state hospital for miners with disabilities.      (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

 

Senate Engrossed   pioneers' home; miners' hospital; continuation
State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024
CHAPTER 161
SENATE BILL 1256

Senate Engrossed

 

pioneers' home; miners' hospital; continuation

 

 

 

State of Arizona

Senate

Fifty-sixth Legislature

Second Regular Session

2024

 

 

 

CHAPTER 161

 

SENATE BILL 1256

 

 

 

An Act

 

repealing section 41-3024.12, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3032.12; relating to the Arizona pioneers' home and state hospital for miners with disabilities. 

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3024.12, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3032.12, to read: START_STATUTE41-3032.12. Arizona pioneers' home; state hospital for miners with disabilities; termination July 1, 2032 A. The Arizona pioneers' home and the state hospital for miners with disabilities terminate on July 1, 2032. B. Title 41, chapter 5, articles 2 and 3 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2033. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona pioneers' home and the state hospital for miners with disabilities to provide services to long-term residents and miners of this state. Sec. 4. Retroactivity  Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2024. 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Repeal

Section 41-3024.12, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.

Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3032.12, to read:

START_STATUTE41-3032.12. Arizona pioneers' home; state hospital for miners with disabilities; termination July 1, 2032

A. The Arizona pioneers' home and the state hospital for miners with disabilities terminate on July 1, 2032.

B. Title 41, chapter 5, articles 2 and 3 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2033. END_STATUTE

Sec. 3. Purpose

Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona pioneers' home and the state hospital for miners with disabilities to provide services to long-term residents and miners of this state.

Sec. 4. Retroactivity 

Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2024.

       APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 16, 2024.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 16, 2024. 

 

 

 

APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 16, 2024.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 16, 2024.