House
|
04/04/2024
|
House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Martinez, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1290. Passed by vv.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (28-27-4-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-2-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Assigned to House TI Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|