Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1335 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 24, 2024
Analysis April 17, 2024
Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024