House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House MOE Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-5-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to House Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to House MOE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|