Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1357 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024