Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Chapter 57
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (38-20-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-3-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|