Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 26, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024