|
04/23/2024
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
|
04/17/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-14-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (37-22-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-3-4-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House WM Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-5-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to House Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to House WM Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|