Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1414 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis August 7, 2024
Analysis June 12, 2024
Analysis April 4, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024