House
|
04/17/2024
|
House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Kolodin, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1459. Passed by vv.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to House ED Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|