Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1459 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024