Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Chapter 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Assigned to House ED Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|