Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1560 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 19, 2024

Chaptered

Bill March 18, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024