Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Chapter 240
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (35-25-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-3-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Assigned to House TI Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-6-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|