Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1567 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis June 4, 2024
Analysis April 10, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024