House
|
03/21/2024
|
House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-7-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|