Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1585 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 20, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024