House | 03/13/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-4-2-0) | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Borrelli moved that a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 which requires a protest in writing to the Secretary of the Senate during the 48 hour notice period be suspended for the purpose of returning Senate Bill 1618 to the calendar of the Committee of the Whole. Motion carried. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |