Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1618 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 2, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024