Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1680 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis June 14, 2024
Analysis April 24, 2024
Analysis April 1, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis March 20, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024