|
04/01/2024
|
Transmitted to Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (32-22-5-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-12-4-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|