Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCM1004 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024